Proceedings of the Subcommittee on
Aboriginal Economic Development in
Relation to Northern National Parks
Second Session Thirty-sixth Parliament, 1999-2000
Chair: The Honourable IONE CHRISTENSENMonday, September 18, 2000
Issue No. 2
First meeting on:Opportunities to expand economic development, including tourism and employment, associated with national parks in Northern Canada
- Minutes of Proceedings
- Transcript (Evidence) of Proceedings (morning sitting) (122K)
- Transcript (Evidence) of Proceedings (afternoon sitting) (114K)
WITNESSES:
From Parks Canada:Bruce Amos, Director General, National Parks;
Steve Langdon, Aboriginal Affairs Secretariat;
Rob Prosper, Superintendent, Georgian Bay.
From the Department of Indian and Northern Affairs Canada:
Bill Austin, Assistant Deputy Minister, Claims and Indian Government;
David Baker, Director General, Strategic Policy and Devolution Branch;
Marc Brooks, Acting Director General, Economic Development Branch.
From the Canadian Nature Federation:
Kevin McNamee, Director of Wildlife Campaigns.
From the Aboriginal Tourism Team Canada:
Virginia Doucett, Executive Director.
From the Canadian Tourism Commission:
Murray Jackson, Vice-President, Product Development.
From the Coalition of First Nations with Interests in National Parks:
Chief Morris Shannacappo, Rolling River First Nations.
From Nunavut Tunngavik Inc.:
John Merritt, Constitutional Advisor.
MEMBERS OF THE SUBCOMMITTEE
The Honourable Ione Christensen, ChairThe Honourable Janis Johnson, Deputy Chair
and
The Honourable Senators:
Andreychuk, * Boudreau, P.C. (or Hays), Cochrane, * Lynch-Staunton (or Kinsella), Sibbeston, Watt
* Ex Officio Members
(Quorum 3)
Changes in membership of the committee:
Pursuant to rule 85(4), membership of the subcommittee was amended as follows:
The name of the Honourable Senator Johnson, substitution pending (September 11, 2000).
The name of the Honourable Senator Cochrane was added (September 5, 2000).
The name of the Honourable Senator Andreychuk was added (September 5, 2000).
The name of the Honourable Senator St. Germain is removed, substitution pending (June 30, 2000).
The name of the Honourable Senator Watt substituted for that of the Honourable Senator Chalifoux (June 29, 2000).