Proceedings of the Standing Senate Committee on
Transport and Communications
First Session, Forty-first Parliament, 2011-12
Chair: The Honourable DENNIS DAWSON
Tuesday, September 25, 2012
Tuesday, October 16, 2012
Wednesday, October 17, 2012
Issue No. 11
Twenty-fifth, twenty-sixth and twenty-seventh meetings on:
The emerging issues related to the Canadian airline industry
- Minutes of Proceedings, September 25, 2012
- Minutes of Proceedings, October 16, 20122
- Minutes of Proceedings, October 17, 2012
- Transcript (Evidence) of Proceedings, September 25, 2012 (48K)
- Transcript (Evidence) of Proceedings, October 16, 2012 (71K)
- Transcript (Evidence) of Proceedings, October 17, 2012 (40K)
WITNESSES
Tuesday, September 25, 2012
Transport Canada:
Colin Stacey, Acting Director General, Air Policy;
Dave Dawson, Director, Airports and Air Navigation Services Policy;
Natalie Bossé, Director General, Airport and Port Programs.
Tuesday, October 16, 2012
Air Transport Association of Canada:
John McKenna, President and Chief Executive Officer;
Les Aalders, Executive Vice President;
Wayne Gouveia, Vice President, Commercial General Aviation.
Exchange Income Corporation:
Michael Pyle, President and Chief Executive Officer;
Adam Terwin, Chief Financial Officer.
Wednesday, October 17, 2012
Northern Air Transport Association:
Stephen Nourse, Executive Director.
MEMBERS OF THE COMMITTEE
The Honourable Dennis Dawson, Chair
The Honourable Stephen Greene, Deputy Chair
and
The Honourable Senators:
Boisvenu, *Cowan (or Tardif), Doyle, Eggleton, P.C., Housakos, *LeBreton, P.C. (or Carignan), MacDonald, Mercer, Merchant, Unger, Verner, P.C., Zimmer
*Ex officio members
(Quorum 4)
Changes in membership of the committee:
Pursuant to rule 12-5, membership of the committee was amended as follows:
The Honourable Senator Housakos replaced the Honourable Senator Stratton (October 19, 2012).
The Honourable Senator Mercer replaced the Honourable Senator Jaffer (October 18, 2012).
The Honourable Senator Stratton replaced the Honourable Senator Housakos (October 17, 2012).
The Honourable Senator Jaffer replaced the Honourable Senator Mercer (October 17, 2012).
The Honourable Senator Housakos replaced the Honourable Senator Martin (September 24, 2012).