Proceedings of the Standing Senate Committee on
Transport and Communications
First Session, Forty-first Parliament, 2011-12-13
Chair: The Honourable DENNIS DAWSON
Wednesday, May 29, 2013 (in camera)
Wednesday, June 5, 2013
Tuesday, June 11, 2013
Wednesday, June 12, 2013
Issue No. 18
First meeting on:
Study on challenges faced by the Canadian Broadcasting Corporation
First, second and third (final) meetings on:
Bill C-52, An Act to amend the Canada Transportation Act
(administration, air and railway transportation and arbitration)
INCLUDING:
THE ELEVENTH REPORT OF THE COMMITTEE
(Bill C-52)
- Orders of Reference
- Minutes of Proceedings, May 29, 2013 (in camera)
- Minutes of Proceedings, June 7, 2013
- Minutes of Proceedings, June 11, 2013
- Minutes of Proceedings, June 12, 2013
- Eleventh Report
- Transcript (Evidence) of Proceedings, June 5, 2013 (32K)
- Transcript (Evidence) of Proceedings, June11, 2013 (82K)
- Transcript (Evidence) of Proceedings, June 12, 2013 (97K)
APPEARING
The Honourable Denis Lebel, P.C., M.P., Minister of Transport, Infrastructure and Communities
WITNESSES
Wednesday, June 5, 2013
Transport Canada:
Annette Gibbons, Director General, Surface Transportation Policy, Surface Freight Policy;
Carolyn Crook, Director, Rail Policy, Surface Freight Policy;
Alain Langlois, Senior Legal Counsel, Team Leader Modal Transportation Law, Legal Services.
Tuesday, June 11, 2013
Forest Products Association of Canada:
Catherine Cobden, Executive Vice-President.
Grain Growers of Canada:
Richard Phillips, Executive Director.
Canadian Fertilizer Institute:
Robert Godfrey, Director, Policy and Government Relations;
Ian MacKay, Legal Counsel.
Western Canadian Shippers' Coalition:
Ian May, Chair;
Allan Foran, Legal Counsel.
Pulse Canada:
Greg Cherewyk, Executive Director.
Wednesday, June 12, 2013
Coalition of Rail Shippers:
Robert Ballantyne, Chairman of the Board; President, Canadian Industrial Transportation Association.
Railway Association of Canada:
Michael Bourque, President and Chief Executive Officer.
Canadian Pacific Railway:
Michael Murphy, Vice-President, Government Affairs.
Canadian National Railway Company:
Sean Finn, Executive Vice-President, Corporate Services and Chief Legal Officer.
MEMBERS OF THE COMMITTEE
The Honourable Dennis Dawson, Chair
The Honourable Stephen Greene, Deputy Chair
and
The Honourable Senators:
Boisvenu, *Cowan (or Tardif), Doyle, Eggleton, P.C., Housakos, *LeBreton, P.C. (or Carignan), MacDonald, Mercer, Merchant, Unger, Verner, P.C., Zimmer
* Ex officio members
(Quorum 4)
Changes in membership of the committee:
Pursuant to rule 12-5, membership of the committee was amended as follows:
The Honourable Senator Fortin-Duplessis replaced the Honourable Senator Housakos (June 11, 2013).
The Honourable Senator Housakos replaced the Honourable Senator Fortin-Duplessis (June 12, 2013).