Proceedings of the Standing Senate Committee on
Banking, Trade and Commerce
First Session, Forty-first Parliament, 2011
Chair: The Honourable MICHAEL A. MEIGHEN
Thursday, November 17, 2011
Wednesday, November 23, 2011
Thursday, November 24, 2011
Issue No. 5
Ninth, tenth and eleventh meetings on:
The present state of the domestic and international financial system
- Minutes of Proceedings - November 17, 2011
- Minutes of Proceedings - November 23, 2011
- Minutes of Proceedings - November 24, 2011
- Transcript (Evidence) of Proceedings - November 17, 2011 (76K)
- Transcript (Evidence) of Proceedings - November 23, 2011 (82K)
- Transcript (Evidence) of Proceedings - November 24, 2011 (99K)
WITNESSES
Thursday, November 17, 2011
Telfer School of Management, University of Ottawa:
Barbara Orser, Deloitte Professor in the Management of Growth Enterprises.
Canadian Women in Communications:
Stephanie MacKendrick, President.
Canadian Women in Technology:
Lynda Partner, Director.
Wednesday, November 23, 2011
Office of the Superintendent of Financial Institutions Canada:
Julie Dickson, Superintendent.
Thursday, November 24, 2011
OMERS Ventures:
John Ruffolo, Chief Executive Officer.
Communitech:
Iain Klugman, President and CEO.
As an individual:
James Brander, Professor, Strategy and Business Economics Division, Sauder School of Business, University of British Columbia (by videoconference).
MEMBERS OF THE COMMITTEE
The Honourable Michael A. Meighen, Chair
The Honourable Céline Hervieux-Payette, P.C., Deputy Chair
and
The Honourable Senators:
*Cowan (or Tardif), Gerstein, Greene, Harb, *LeBreton, P.C. (or Carignan), Massicotte, Moore, Oliver, Ringuette, Smith (Saurel), Stewart Olsen, Tkachuk
*Ex officio members
(Quorum 4)
Changes in membership of the committee:
Pursuant to rule 85(4), membership of the committee was amended as follows:
The Honourable Senator Stewart Olsen replaced the Honourable Senator Eaton (November 16, 2011).
The Honourable Senator Eaton replaced the Honourable Senator Stewart Olsen (November 16, 2011).