Proceedings of the Standing Senate Committee on
National Finance
First Session, Forty-second Parliament, 2015-16-17-18-19
Chair: The Honourable PERCY MOCKLER
Tuesday, March 19, 2019 (in camera)
Wednesday, March 20, 2019
Issue No. 90
Fifth and final meeting:
Supplementary Estimates (B) for the fiscal year ending March 31, 2019
Second and final meeting:
Interim Estimates for the fiscal year ending March 31, 2020
Third meeting:
Study on the processes and financial aspects of the Government of Canada's system of defence procurement
INCLUDING:
THE THIRTY-EIGHTH REPORT OF THE COMMITTEE
(Final Report on the Supplementary Estimates (B) 2018-19)
THE THIRTY-NINTH REPORT OF THE COMMITTEE
(Final Report on the 2019-20 Interim Estimates)
WITNESSES
March 20, 2019
Davie:
James Davies, President, Davie Shipbuilding Inc.;
John Schmidt, Vice President, Commercial and Government Programs, Davie Shipbuilding Inc.
Irving:
James Irving, Co-Chief Executive Officer, J.D. Irving, Limited;
Ross Langley, Executive Vice President, J.D. Irving, Limited;
Kevin McCoy, President, Irving Shipbuilding Inc.;
Scott Jamieson, Vice President, Programs, Irving Shipbuilding Inc.
Seaspan Shipyards:
Mark Lamarre, Chief Executive Officer;
Tim Page, Vice President, Government Relations.
MEMBERS OF THE COMMITTEE
The Honourable Percy Mockler, Chair
The Honourable Mobina S.B. Jaffer, Deputy Chair
The Honourable André Pratte, Deputy Chair
and
The Honourable Senators:
Andreychuk, *Day (or Mercer), Deacon (Nova Scotia), Deacon (Ontario), Duncan, Eaton, Forest, Forest-Niesing, *Harder, P.C. or Bellemare) (or Mitchell), Klyne, Marshall, Neufeld, *Smith (or Martin), *Woo (or Saint-Germain)
* Ex officio members
(Quorum 4)
Changes in membership of the committee:
Pursuant to rule 12-5 and to the orders of the Senate of November 7, 2017 and of November 20, 2018, membership of the committee was amended as follows:
The Honourable Senator Neufeld replaced the Honourable Senator Manning (March 20, 2019).
The Honourable Senator Manning replaced the Honourable Senator Neufeld (March 19, 2019).
The Honourable Senator Deacon (Nova Scotia) replaced the Honourable Senator Boehm (March 18, 2019).
The Honourable Senator Duncan was added to the membership (February 28, 2019).
The Honourable Senator Moncion was removed from the membership of the committee, substitution pending (February 28, 2019).
The Honourable Senator Neufeld replaced the Honourable Senator Manning (February 28, 2019).